List of austrian chancellors
WebThe chart below shows a timeline of the social-democratic chairpersons and the Chancellors of Austria since 1945. The left bar shows all the chairpersons ( Bundesparteivorsitzende , abbreviated as CP ) of the SPÖ, and the right bar shows the corresponding make-up of the Austrian government at that time. Webenwiki List of chancellors of Austria; eswiki Anexo:Canciller de Austria; fawiki فهرست صدراعظمهای اتریش; fiwiki Luettelo Itävallan liittokanslereista; frwiki Liste des chanceliers …
List of austrian chancellors
Did you know?
WebChancery. Details 12 Talbot Street , Forrest, ACT 2603 Email Address . Details [email protected] Web Site Url . Details www ... Friday: 8.30 am - 4.30 pm Consular: 9.00 am - 12.00 pm His Excellency Mr Wolfgang Lukas STROHMAYER. Ambassador of Austria (19 February 2024) Mrs Natalie STROHMAYER. Mrs Viktoria WAGNER. Minister-Counsellor … Web34 rijen · The minister-president of Austria was the head of government of the Austrian …
WebState chancellors of the Archduchy of Austria (1527–1804) From 1664/69 the Privy Conference (Geheime Konferenz), a committee of the Imperial Privy Council (Geheimer Rat), provided advice to Emperor Leopold I whereby the Austrian court chancellor, responsible for the Habsburg 'Hereditary Lands', served as rapporteur and thereby … There have been ten chancellors who served under the First Republic until Chancellor Engelbert Dollfuss created the authoritarian and dictatorial Federal State of Austria. Following Dollfuss's assassination by Austrian National Socialists , [5] Kurt Schuschnigg succeeded him as chancellor and upheld the … Meer weergeven The chancellor of Austria is the head of government of Austria, appointed by the president and viewed as the country's de facto chief executive. The chancellor chairs and leads the Cabinet, which also includes the Meer weergeven • History of Austria • Politics of Austria • Elections in Austria • President of Austria • List of presidents of Austria Meer weergeven • Official website of the Austrian Chancellery • List of Chancellors since 1945 on the Chancellery website Meer weergeven
WebThis list is comprised of Austrian Chancellors and Presidents. The positions were established in 1919 upon the formation of the First Austrian Republic. The Chancellor … Web28 mrt. 2024 · Opposition leader Pamela Rendi-Wagner announced she would be a candidate for the Federal Chancellery, but do people in Austria actually vote for …
WebBruno Kreisky (22 January 1911 – 29 July 1990) was an Austrian social democratic politician who served as Foreign Minister from 1959 to 1966 and as Chancellor from …
Web6 aug. 2015 · SNo,Phase,Period,Name,Took office,Left office,Political party1,Chancellor of theRepublic of German-Austria,19181919,Karl Renner,30-10 1918,21-10 1919,SDAP … g502 mouse click issueWeb25 jul. 2024 · Toby pioneered lawyer “win rates” and co-founded Premonition, the World’s largest litigation database. He began his career … g502 lightspeed priceWebSupreme Chancellors Category page. Edit Edit source History Talk (0) This category is for Supreme Chancellors of the Galactic Republic. In other languages. Deutsch; español; français; ქართული ... glasses according to faceWebThere have been ten chancellors who served under the First Republic until Chancellor Engelbert Dollfuss created the authoritarian and dictatorial Federal State of Austria. … glasses activewearWebFollowing World War I, the office was established by the Provisional National Assembly on 30 October 1918 and named state chancellor of the Republic of German-Austria, and its … glasservice tesinkWebChancellor of Austria. The chancellor of the Republic of Austria ( German: Bundeskanzler der Republik Österreich) is the head of government of the Republic of Austria. The position corresponds to that of Prime Minister in several other parliamentary democracies. Current officeholder is Karl Nehammer of the Austrian People's Party (ÖVP), who ... g502 mouse scroll wheel just rollsWebThe Federal Chancellor of the Republic of Austria, Karl Nehammer Photo: Andy Wenzel/ BKA Responsibilities and functions The Austrian Federal Chancellor is the head of … glasser \u0026 glasser law firm